Pless, Robert Paul (CPSO#: 58000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Canada
0603B1
100 Eglantine Driveway
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone: (613) 668-1925
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT PAUL PLESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLESS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1988