Plourde, Charles-Etienne (CPSO#: 110690)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles-Etienne Plourde Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Plourde ( CPSO# 110690)

Business Address:
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2018