Poddar, Megha (CPSO#: 93361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Aviva Medical Specialist Clinic
2951 Walkers Line, Suite 305
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: 1-855-210-0757
Fax: 855-210-0758
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

AVIVA Medical Specialists Clinic
180 Vine Street South
Suite 306
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Canada
Phone: 1-855-210-0757
Fax: 855-210-0758
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Wharton Medical Clinic
414 Victoria Street
Suite M14
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-7663
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: 519-421-4211
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Poddar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Poddar ( CPSO# 93361 )
Dr. P. Seth ( CPSO# 90639 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1

Business Address:
210 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4

Business Address:
Suite M14
414 Victoria Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8

Business Address:
Suite 306
180 Vine Street South
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGHA PODDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PODDAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2015 to 15 May 2016
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2014