Poitier, Myles Robert (CPSO#: 75700)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Apr 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Spartan Health Sciences University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MCI the Doctors Office at Bramalea
Bramalea City Centre
Suite 387
25 Peel Centre Drive
Brampton ON  L6T 3R5
Phone: (905) 793-7077
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Urgent Care Centre
4000 Hwy 7 #2
Vaughan ON  L4L 8Z2
Canada
Phone: 416 741 2273
Fax: 905 851 0682
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Myles Poitier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Poitier ( CPSO# 75700 )

Business Address:
MCI the Doctors Office at Bramalea
Bramalea City Centre
Suite 387
25 Peel Centre Drive
Brampton ON  L6T 3R5
Phone Number: (905) 793-7077

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Bahamas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 2002 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 02 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Oct 2001 to 02 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Myles  Robert  Poitier  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  Family
            Medicine, only.