Pole, Meena Laxman (CPSO#: 74658)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Bombay, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 May 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001