Poliakova, Elena Borissova (CPSO#: 95831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 4K9
Phone: 1-519-742-3611
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Poliakova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Poliakova ( CPSO# 95831 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELENA BORISSOVA POLIAKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLIAKOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2014