Poliquin, Sophie Anne (CPSO#: 90997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McArthur Medical Centre
Ottawa ON  K1L 6N6
Phone: (613) 741-1134
Fax: (613) 741-4276
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hopital Montfort
713, chemin de Montréal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Public Health
179, Clarence Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 7E5
Canada
Phone: (613) 234-4641
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sophie Poliquin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Poliquin ( CPSO# 90997 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Public Health
179 Clarence Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5P7
Phone Number: (613) 234-4641

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
McArthur Medical Centre
390 MacArthur Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 6N6
Phone Number: (613) 741-1134

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOPHIE ANNE POLIQUIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLIQUIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2011