Polis, Ilona Cecylia (CPSO#: 65729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301 Metcalfe Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1R9
Phone: (613) 565-3479
Fax: (613) 565-8763
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ilona Polis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Polis ( CPSO# 65729 )

Business Address:
301 Metcalfe Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1R9
Phone Number: (613) 565-3479

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILONA CECYLIA POLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 23 Apr 2001 to 11 May 2001
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 May 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2002