Pollanen, Michael Sven (CPSO#: 73983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Forensic Pathology Service
25 Morton Shulman Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone: (647) 329-1914
Fax: (416) 314-4060
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL SVEN POLLANEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLLANEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2003