Ponchon, Thierry (CPSO#: 75692)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: Ponchon, Thiery (used until: 30 Aug 2005 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universite de Lyon I, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2008