Poolacherla, Vasavi Raju (CPSO#: 105504)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Tamil, Telugu

Education:Sri Venkatesvara University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vasavi Raju Poolacherla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 22 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: McMaster Childrens Hospital, 1200 Main Street West, Hamilton, ON, L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Jan 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016