Poole, Robert Trevor (CPSO#: 86362)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
stroud medical centre
7869 Yonge St. Suite 1
Innisfil
Stroud ON  L9S 1K8
Phone: (705) 436-2251
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.T. Poole Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Poole ( CPSO# 86362 )

Business Address:
Stroud Medical Centre
1 - 7869 Yonge Street
Box 7041
Innisfil ON  L9S 1K8
Phone Number: (705) 436-2251

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT TREVOR POOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POOLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2009