Poon, Eugenia (CPSO#: 95331)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
4001 Leslie St
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eugenia Poon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Poon ( CPSO# 95331 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6520

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EUGENIA POON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 29 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 29 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 04 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017