Poon, Ian Din Tsun (CPSO#: 69019)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre - Sunnybrook H
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4951
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Poon and Dr. Shaneka Kulasingham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Poon ( CPSO# 69019 )
Dr. S. Kulasingham ( CPSO# 69003 )

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-4941

Business Address:
Toronto Sunnybrook Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4951

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN DIN TSUN POON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2001