Poon, Jackson Chesing (CPSO#: 80893)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayview Family Physicians
Suite 203
9160 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E6
Phone: (905) 889-7997 Ext. x 5
Fax: (905) 889-2666
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jackson Poon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Poon ( CPSO# 80893 )

Business Address:
Bayview Family Physicians
203 - 9160 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E6
Phone Number: (905) 889-7997

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACKSON CHESING POON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2006