Poonah, Muhammad Fairoze (CPSO#: 93158)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sint Eustatius, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Downtown Professional Centre
Suite 202
83 Mill St
Georgetown ON  L7G 5E9
Phone: (905) 873-2402
Fax: (905) 873-2411
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Intrepid Health Centre
Riverview Heights
75 Montpelier St
Brampton ON  L6Y6H4
Canada
Phone: 2894014678
Fax: 2894014676
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Intrepid Medical Centre
Unit 106
250 Dundas St W
Mississauga ON  L5B1J2
Canada
Phone: 9052752273
Fax: 9052752297
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.F. Poonah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Poonah ( CPSO# 93158 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
83 Mill Street
Georgetown ON  L7G 5E9
Phone Number: (905) 873-2402

Business Address:
75 Montpelier Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 6H4
Phone Number: (289) 401-4678

Business Address:
106-250 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1J2
Phone Number: (905) 275-2273

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD FAIROZE POONAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POONAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012