Popescu, Ligia Maria (CPSO#: 73557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 596-1320
Fax: (613) 596-3933
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIGIA MARIA POPESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPESCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2001