Popoola, Abraham Jones (CPSO#: 94989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Lagos, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2313
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

PHOENIX HEALTHCARE CENTER
SUITE 301
450 FREDERICK STREET
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P5
Canada
Phone: (519) 748-6933
Fax: (519) 893-9733
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Popoola Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Popoola ( CPSO# 94989 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 722-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 05 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABRAHAM JONES POPOOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPOOLA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 May 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2012