Popovic, Jovan (CPSO#: 75500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jan 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Serbian

Education:Rheinisch-Westfalische Tech Hochschule, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NYU Langone Medical Center
Outpatient Surgery
339 East 38th Street
New York NY  10016
United States
Phone: (212) 263-1116
Fax: (212) 263-1171

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOVAN POPOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 13 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2003