Popuri, Padma (CPSO#: 78917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: Puranam, Padma (used until: 09 Dec 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sri Venkatesvara University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health sciences north
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7147
Fax: (705) 671-7392
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Puranam Krishna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Krishna ( CPSO# 78690 )
Dr. P. Popuri ( CPSO# 78917 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone Number: (705) 675-5900

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PADMA POPURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPURI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Nov 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 03 Apr 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2008