Porepa, Liane Faith (CPSO#: 84736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: Porepa, Liane (used until: 22 Jun 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 602
581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 953-7917
Fax: (905) 953-0046
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Heart Function Program, Suite 513
581 Davis Drive
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Medical Arts Building at Southlake
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 2171
Fax: 905-952-2462
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Unit 21-23
117 Young Street
Alliston ON  L9R 0E9
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Porepa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Porepa ( CPSO# 84736 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9

Business Address:
Suite 602
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 953-7917

Business Address:
Heart Function Program
Suite 513
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
17 Young Street
Suites 21-23
Alliston ON  L9R 0E9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIANE FAITH POREPA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POREPA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010