Porter, Stephen Calder (CPSO#: 94413)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 04 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cincinnati, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 25 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2016