Posan, Emoke Terezia (CPSO#: 81646)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Debrecen, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 23 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2006 to 31 Oct 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010