Pothier, David Douglas (CPSO#: 91887)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Brenda Longo UHN 200 Elizabeth St Toronto, ON M5G 2C4 Phone: 416-310-4800
Date Received: 23 Jul 2018

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 15 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 2018