Potts Jr, Maurice Basil (CPSO#: 82689)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Tippett Richardson Records Management 201 Sheppard Street East Windsor, Ontario N8X 2K6 Tel: (519) 254-5111
Date Received: 14 Aug 2008

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 May 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 04 Apr 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008