Potvin, Nicholas Anthony (CPSO#: 95000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS ANTHONY POTVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTVIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 09 May 2011 to 20 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2018