Pour-Ahmadi, Omid (CPSO#: 91820)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Spanish

Education:Universidad Techologica De Santiago, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 03 Aug 2009 to 25 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Aug 2011 to 16 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Oct 2012