Pourabdollah, Maryam (CPSO#: 112588)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 16 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Div of Haematological Pathology
Eaton Building 11th Floor
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARYAM POURABDOLLAH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. POURABDOLLAH is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. POURABDOLLAH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. POURABDOLLAH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. POURABDOLLAH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. POURABDOLLAH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. POURABDOLLAH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Dec 2017
Assessment Verification Period - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019