Pouteau, Kathleen Marie (CPSO#: 79577)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primary Health Care Unit
P.O. Bag 4000
4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1K2
Phone: (807) 737-5166
Fax: (807) 737-4364
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Balderson Pouteau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Balderson ( CPSO# 78856 )
Dr. K. Pouteau ( CPSO# 79577 )

Business Address:
Primary Health Care Unit
P O Bag 4000
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1K2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN MARIE POUTEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POUTEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2006