Powell, Anne Christine (CPSO#: 77657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210B
325 West Street
Brantford ON  N3R 3V6
Phone: (226) 730-0011
Fax: (226) 730-0012
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gregory J. Rutledge & Dr. Anne C. Powell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rutledge ( CPSO# 77609 )
Dr. A. Powell ( CPSO# 77657 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Business Address:
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone Number: (519) 753-8666

Business Address:
210B - 325 West Street
Brantford ON  N3R 3V6
Phone Number: (226) 730-0011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE CHRISTINE POWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007