Powell, Steven Brian (CPSO#: 75671)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 28 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2003