Powers, Peter James (CPSO#: 26417)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter James Powers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Powers ( CPSO# 26417 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Suite F309
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6024

Medical Records Location

Address: St Joseph's Hospital 50 Charlton Ave E Hamilton, ON L8N 4A6
Date Received: 24 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018