Powles, Kristina Elisabeth (CPSO#: 91355)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 516
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone: (416) 486-8444
Fax: (416) 486-2193
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Granovsky Gluskin Family Medicine
4th Floor, 60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5158
Fax: (416) 586-3175
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTINA ELISABETH POWLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWLES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2012 to 01 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Mar 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2011