Powlowski, Marcus T (CPSO#: 57083)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bislama, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Science Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: 8076846100
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lansdell & Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Francis ( CPSO# 71385 )
Dr. K. Lansdell ( CPSO# 93305 )
Dr. S. Chapman ( CPSO# 93976 )
Dr. A. Exley ( CPSO# 95194 )
Dr. M. Heringer ( CPSO# 98149 )
Dr. D. Savage ( CPSO# 103493)
Dr. T. Lai ( CPSO# 103634)
Dr. P. Martel ( CPSO# 75620 )
Dr. M. Garnett ( CPSO# 95471 )
Dr. R. Coulombe ( CPSO# 85597 )
Dr. J. VanderBurgh ( CPSO# 88595 )
Dr. S. Green ( CPSO# 86498 )
Dr. W. MacGregor ( CPSO# 69621 )
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 88444 )
Dr. F. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 89299 )
Dr. D. Wood ( CPSO# 69249 )
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 66746 )
Dr. W. Neilipovitz ( CPSO# 61636 )
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )
Dr. M. Powlowski ( CPSO# 57083 )
Dr. D. Mutrie ( CPSO# 30037 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 91016 )
Dr. B. Jacobson ( CPSO# 83213 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4


Corporation Name: Marcus Powlowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Powlowski ( CPSO# 57083 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ethiopia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCUS T POWLOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWLOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1987