Pozdnyakov, Sergey Borisovich (CPSO#: 91962)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Arkhangelsk State Medical University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 03 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 04 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Oct 2009 to 03 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 04 Aug 2010 to 03 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 04 Aug 2011 to 03 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 04 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2015