Pozgay, Anita Maria (CPSO#: 73144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Apr 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2202 Thurston Ave.
Ottawa ON  K1G 6E1
Canada
Phone: (613) 730-5483
Fax: 6137305484
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.M. Pozgay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pozgay ( CPSO# 73144 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
2202 Thurston Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1G 6E1
Phone Number: (613) 730-5483

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANITA MARIA POZGAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POZGAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 1998 to 10 Jan 1999
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2001