Prabhakar, Christopher (CPSO#: 89665)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 29 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Jul 2011
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jul 2011