Prabhu, Atul Joseph (CPSO#: 75301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Bangalore University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
399 Bathurst Street Rm 2 MCL 431
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.J. Prabhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Prabhu ( CPSO# 75301 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Room 2, MCL 431
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATUL JOSEPH PRABHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRABHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2008