Pradan, Silvia Liana (CPSO#: 88992)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 20 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 11 Feb 2011
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Mar 2012
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Mar 2012 to 29 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2012