Prapaitrakool, Sunisa (CPSO#: 90081)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Chulalongkorn University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2009 to 06 Feb 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Mar 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2010