Praught, Jeffery Christopher (CPSO#: 93193)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CF Health Services Center Atlantic
PO Box 99000, Stn Forces
Halifax NS  B3K 5X5
Phone: 902-427-0550

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFERY CHRISTOPHER PRAUGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRAUGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012