Predescu, Alexandra Gabriela (CPSO#: 94209)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2010 to 21 Oct 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 22 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2012