Predescu, Dragos (CPSO#: 83247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Sep 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Division of Cardiology
Department of Paediatrics
1200 Main Street West Rm 3A41
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75206
Fax: (905) 521-7914
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Predescu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Predescu ( CPSO# 83247 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Children's Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Department of Paediatrics HHS
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Sep 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 12 Aug 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 13 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Dragos Predescu may practise medicine only:

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, Division of Cardiology, McMaster University, in which
                        Dr. Predescu holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Predescu
                  no longer holds the appointment referred to in clause 1.