Preston, Stephen (CPSO#: 93647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
270 Charlotte St. #301
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone: 705-748-6540
Fax: 705-201-2320
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Preston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Preston ( CPSO# 93647 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
301 - 270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone Number: (705) 748-6540

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN PRESTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRESTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015