Preyra, Ian James Robert (CPSO#: 73607)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare
System Hamilton
Emergency Department
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 38510
Fax: (905) 573-4842
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Preyra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 3 2008


Corporation Name: Ian Preyra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Preyra ( CPSO# 73607 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare System-Hamilton
Emergency Department
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN JAMES ROBERT PREYRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREYRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004