Price, Victoria Elizabeth (CPSO#: 78255)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Haematology/Oncology Effective: 27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 15 Jul 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2004