Pridham, Cheryl Jennifer (CPSO#: 90599)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: MacAulay, Cheryl Jennifer (used until: 24 Nov 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
143 Metcalfe Street, 3rd floor
Elora ON
PO Box 3000
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone: (519) 846-5345
Fax: (519) 846-8544
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cheryl Pridham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pridham ( CPSO# 90599 )

Business Address:
143 Metcalfe Street
3rd Floor
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone Number: (519) 846-5345

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERYL JENNIFER PRIDHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIDHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011