Prieditis, Juris George Paul (CPSO#: 20402)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: MCI Medical Clinics INC., 1 Yorkdale Road, Suite 320, Toronto, ON M6A 3A1
Date Received: 01 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1970 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015