Prigozhikh, Viachislav (CPSO#: 87649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Aug 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Irkutsk State Medical University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Champagne Centre
Unit B10
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 222-6160 Ext. 225
Fax: (416) 645-1979
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prigozhikh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Prigozhikh ( CPSO# 87649 )

Business Address:
Champagne Centre
Unit B10
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 222-6160

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 29 Aug 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Nov 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2008 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.   Viachislav   Prigozhikh  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
                  neurology, only.