Primeau, Andrew James (CPSO#: 96881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North Eastern Urgent Care Clinic
3557 Errington Ave
Chelmsford ON  P0M 1L0
Canada
Phone: 705-590-2350
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew J. Primeau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Primeau ( CPSO# 96881 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
3557 Errington Avenue
Chelmsford ON  P0M 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 590-2350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 15 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES PRIMEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIMEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 21 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2014